US HB4529 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accelerating Access to Capital Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to revise Form S-3 so as to permit securities to be registered pursuant to General Instruction I.B.1. of the form if the registrant has at least one class of common equity securities listed and registered on a national securities exchange. The SEC must also revise General Instruction I.B.6. of Form S-3 to allow certain registrants to use that instruction to offer up to one-third of the aggregate market value of their common equity even if they are not registered on a national securities exchange.
Title
Accelerating Access to Capital Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436. |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-576. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 26. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-12-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.