US HB4528 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-228. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-228. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical amendments to certain marine fish conservation statutes, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Billfish Conservation Act of 2012 to limit the sale of billfish caught by U.S. fishing vessels. Under current law, billfish that are caught by U.S. vessels and landed (unloaded onshore) in Hawaii or Pacific Insular Areas (American Samoa, Baker Island, Guam, Howland Island, Jarvis Island, Johnston Atoll, Kingman Reef, Midway Island, the Northern Mariana Islands, Palmyra Atoll, and Wake Island) may be sold and exported to non-U.S. markets or transported to other U.S. markets. This bill requires billfish caught by U.S. vessels and landed in Hawaii or Pacific Insular Areas to be retained for sale in those areas.
Title
To make technical amendments to certain marine fish conservation statutes, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-228. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5437) |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 486. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5622) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4528. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5622-5623) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 601. |
2018-06-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-775. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2018-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-12-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB396 (Same As) 2017-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Subjects
American Samoa
Fishes
Guam
Hawaii
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Micronesia
Public lands and natural resources
Trade restrictions
U.S. territories and protectorates
Fishes
Guam
Hawaii
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Micronesia
Public lands and natural resources
Trade restrictions
U.S. territories and protectorates