US HB4508 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROSPER Act Promoting Real Opportunity, Success, and Prosperity through Education Reform Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROSPER Act Promoting Real Opportunity, Success, and Prosperity through Education Reform Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 413.
2018-02-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-550.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 17.
2017-12-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
2017-12-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1123 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB1635 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2679 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3957 (Related) 2017-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB4336 (Related) 2017-11-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB2081 (Related) 2017-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Area studies and international education
Assault and harassment offenses
Business education
Child care and development
Child health
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Education
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Minority education
Minority employment
Policy sciences
Public contracts and procurement
School administration
Science and engineering education
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback