US HB4506 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010 - Amends the federal judicial code to authorize the appointment of additional permanent bankruptcy judges in various states. Converts certain temporary offices of bankruptcy judges to permanent offices in specified states. Extends certain temporary offices of bankruptcy judges previously authorized for Pennsylvania and North Carolina. Increases bankruptcy filing fees. Reduces the amount of bankruptcy fees to be deposited as offsetting collections to the United States Trustee System Fund.
Title
Bankruptcy Judgeship Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412. | |
2010-05-27 | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report. | |
2010-05-27 | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-03-15 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-03-12 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-12 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 345 - 5 (Roll no. 111). (text: CR 3/10/2010 H1235-1236) | |
2010-03-12 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1375-1376) | |
2010-03-10 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-03-10 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4506. | |
2010-03-10 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1235-1238) | |
2010-03-10 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246. | |
2010-03-09 | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-430. | |
2010-01-27 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2010-01-27 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |