US HB4467 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Aviation Security Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Transportation (DOT) to require the Federal Air Marshal Service to use a risk-based strategy when allocating resources between international and domestic flight coverage, including when setting its annual target number of flights to cover. DOT shall ensure that the seating arrangements of federal air marshals on aircraft are determined in a manner that is risk-based and most capable of responding to current threats to aviation security.
Title
Strengthening Aviation Security Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 128 (Y: 408 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571. |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 128). |
2018-03-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2027-2028) |
2018-03-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4467. |
2018-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1671-1673; text: CR H1671-1672) |
2018-03-19 | House | Mr. Bacon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464. |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-608. |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security Discharged. |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security. |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3144 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4176 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4176 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Law enforcement officers
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Law enforcement officers
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security