US HB4466 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financial Regulatory Clarity Act of 2014 - Requires the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC), the Office of Comptroller of the Currency, the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (CFPB), the National Credit Union Administration (NCUA), the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC), and the Commodity Futures Trading Commission (CFTC), before issuing a regulation or order, to assess other federal regulations and orders to determine whether the agency's proposal is in conflict with, is inconsistent with, or is duplicative of such other regulations or orders and whether such other federal regulations or orders are outdated.
Title
Financial Regulatory Clarity Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Vance McAllister [R-LA] |
Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25. |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2013-12-04 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2829 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Congressional oversight
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
National Credit Union Administration
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Congressional oversight
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
National Credit Union Administration
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4466/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4466/BILLS-113hr4466ih.pdf |