US HB4459 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charitable Conservation Easement Program Integrity Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to limit the aggregate amount of a partner's annual tax deductions for qualified conservation contributions of a partnership to 2.5 times the partner's adjusted basis in the partnership. (Under current law, a "qualified conservation contribution" is the contribution of a qualified real property interest to a qualified organization exclusively for conservation purposes.) The limitation applies for the first five years after the individual becomes a partner in the partnership. It does not apply to certain family partnerships.
Title
Charitable Conservation Easement Program Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HB567 (Same As) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SB2436 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1166)
HB567 (Same As) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SB2436 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1166)
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Taxation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Taxation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4459/BILLS-115hr4459ih.pdf |