US HB445 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Heavy Duty Hybrid Vehicle Research, Development, and Demonstration Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of Energy to establish a competitive research, development, demonstration, and commercial application program to provide between three and seven grants of up to $3 million per year each to applicants to carry out projects to advance research and development and to demonstrate technologies, including plug-in hybrid technology, for advanced heavy duty hybrid vehicles. Requires each grant recipient to be required to complete two phases: (1) phase one, research and demonstration of advanced hybrid technology by producing or retrofitting one or more advanced heavy duty hybrid vehicles; and (2) phase two, demonstration of advanced manufacturing processes and technologies by producing or retrofitting 50 advanced heavy duty hybrid vehicles. Directs the Secretary to: (1) conduct research into alternative power train designs for use in advanced heavy duty hybrid vehicles; and (2) establish a pilot program through the National Laboratories and Technology Centers of the Department of Energy to research and test the effects on the domestic electric power grid of the widespread use of plug-in hybrid vehicles, including plug-in hybrid vehicles that are advanced heavy duty hybrid vehicles. Authorizes appropriations for FY2010-FY2012. Amends the United States Energy Storage Competitiveness Act of 2007 to direct the Secretary to conduct an applied research program on energy storage systems to support vehicles with a gross weight over 16,000 pounds.
Title
Heavy Duty Hybrid Vehicle Research, Development, and Demonstration Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Biggert [R-IL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] | Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Charles Wilson [D-OH] | Rep. David Wu [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-09-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9355-9356) | |
2009-09-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 445. | |
2009-09-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9355-9357) | |
2009-09-09 | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Science and Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
SB679 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 621.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Climate change
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Manufacturing
Product development and innovation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Technology transfer and commercialization
Air quality
Climate change
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Manufacturing
Product development and innovation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Technology transfer and commercialization