US HB4444 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Western Area Power Administration (WAPA) to establish a pilot project to provide increased transparency for its customers. WAPA must publicly display on its website a database of specific information dating back to FY2008, including rates charged to customers for power and transmission services, listed by power system; the amount of capacity or energy sold by power system; and a detailed accounting of its expenditures and costs by region and for the headquarters office. Additionally, WAPA must annually update the information it provides on the website. The updates must include specified details regarding changes to the information, the reasons for the changes, and the amount of unobligated balances retained. The pilot project shall terminate in seven years.
Title
Western Area Power Administration Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 533. |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-649. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1931 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Public utilities and utility rates
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Public utilities and utility rates