US HB4381 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to the determination, termination, and renewal of public health emergencies, and for other purposes.
Title
PHE Congressional Review Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 21. |
2023-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 12. |
2023-07-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4381/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4381/BILLS-118hr4381ih.pdf |