US HB4376 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Energy Research Infrastructure Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to: (1) provide for the upgrade to the Advanced Light Source described in the publication titled "Report on Facility Upgrades" approved by the Basic Energy Sciences Advisory Committee on June 9, 2016, and (2) ensure that the start of full operations for such upgrade occurs by December 31, 2026. (Sec. 3) DOE shall: (1) provide for the upgrade to the Linac Coherent Light Source II facility as described in such publication, and (2) ensure that the start of full operations for such upgrade occurs by December 31, 2025. (Sec. 4) DOE shall: (1) provide for a Facility for Rare Isotope Beams to advance the understanding of rare nuclear isotopes and the evolution of the cosmos, and (2) ensure that the start of full operations for such facility occurs by June 30, 2022, with early operations beginning in 2018.
Title
Department of Energy Research Infrastructure Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1096) |
2018-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4376. |
2018-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1095-1097) |
2018-02-13 | House | Mr. Weber (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 418. |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-556. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4377 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Astronomy
California
Department of Energy
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
California
Department of Energy
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications