US HB4367 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to support increasing the use of the International Monetary Fund (IMF) administrative budget for technical assistance to help IMF members fight money laundering and funding for terrorism. The National Advisory Council on International Monetary and Financial Policies shall report on such efforts.
Title
Fight Illicit Finance through Technical Assistance Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2514 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2513 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4084 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2514 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2513 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4084 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Multilateral development programs
Terrorism
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Multilateral development programs
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4367/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4367/BILLS-116hr4367ih.pdf |