US HB435 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disposal of Excess Federal Lands Act of 2015 Directs the Secretary of the Interior to offer for disposal by competitive sale certain federal lands in Arizona, Colorado, Idaho, Montana, Nebraska, Nevada, New Mexico, Oregon, Utah, and Wyoming, previously identified as suitable for disposal in the report submitted to Congress on May 27, 1997, pursuant to the Federal Agriculture Improvement and Reform Act of 1996.
Title
Disposal of Excess Federal Lands Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB361 (Same As) 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Arizona
Colorado
Idaho
Land transfers
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Wyoming
Colorado
Idaho
Land transfers
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Wyoming
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/435/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr435/BILLS-114hr435ih.pdf |