US HB4334 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-131. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-131. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes, reauthorizes, and revises several programs administered by the Department of Health and Human Services and the Department of Labor relating to care for the elderly. Among other things, the bill reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises programs that support caregivers of the elderly; informational services, such as pension counseling; nutritional services, such as meal delivery; disease prevention and health promotion services; community and workforce training regarding elder care; and abuse and neglect prevention services. The bill also establishes several entities and programs to further support elder care, including initiatives that aim to promote independent living and reduce social isolation for the elderly.
Title
Dignity in Aging Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-131. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-03-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-11 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1640-1648) |
2020-03-11 | House | Ms. Bonamici asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H1640-1648) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1430-1438) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.1461 Amendment SA 1461 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.1461 Amendment SA 1461 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S1445; text: CR S1430-1438) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1445) |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 280. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8466-8472) |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4334. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8466-8479) |
2019-10-28 | House | Ms. Bonamici moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 206. |
2019-10-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 116-258. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-09-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3782 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1671 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4833 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4846 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4853 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4859 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB5323 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB2696 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1671 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4833 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4846 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4853 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4859 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB5323 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB2696 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Aging
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Homeland Security
Disability and paralysis
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Family services
Financial literacy
Food assistance and relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Home and outpatient care
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Lawyers and legal services
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Nutrition and diet
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Sexually transmitted diseases
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Aging
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Homeland Security
Disability and paralysis
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Family services
Financial literacy
Food assistance and relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Home and outpatient care
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Lawyers and legal services
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Nutrition and diet
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Sexually transmitted diseases
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Urban and suburban affairs and development