US HB4318 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2018 This bill amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States (HTS) to: (1) repeal expired reductions in rates of duty for specified chemicals and other items; and (2) provide for duty suspensions and reductions through December 31, 2020, for specified chemicals and other items. The bill amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend through April 22, 2026, (currently, January 14, 2026) the authority of the Department of the Treasury to collect certain customs user fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 402 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-239.
2018-09-13SenateSigned by President.
2018-09-06SenatePresented to President.
2018-09-04SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-04SenateOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7784-7785)
2018-09-04SenateDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendments to H.R. 4318.
2018-09-04SenateMr. Brady (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H7784-7786)
2018-07-30SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-07-26SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5438)
2018-07-26SenateS.Amdt.3664 Amendment SA 3664 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-26SenateS.Amdt.3664 Amendment SA 3664 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S5438; text: CR S5438) To improve the bill.
2018-07-26SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5438)
2018-07-26SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2018-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-01-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-01-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 18). (text: CR H185-385)
2018-01-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H185-385)
2018-01-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-01-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4318.
2018-01-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H395-396)
2018-01-16HouseMr. Bishop (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-11-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2108 (Same As) 2017-11-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback