US HB4298 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-25)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vietnam Helicopter Crew Memorial Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Army to place in Arlington National Cemetery a memorial honoring helicopter pilots and crew members who served on active duty in the Armed Forces during the Vietnam era. The Army may place such a memorial only if it enters into an agreement under which the association agrees to: (1) pay all costs necessary to construct, install, and maintain the memorial; and (2) to such other provisions as the Army may require.
Title
Vietnam Helicopter Crew Memorial Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7328) |
2016-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4298. |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7328-7330) |
2016-12-07 | House | Mr. Heck (NV) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Aviation and airports
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Monuments and memorials
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
Virginia
Asia
Aviation and airports
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Monuments and memorials
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
Virginia