US HB4296 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To place requirements on operational risk capital requirements for banking organizations established by an appropriate Federal banking agency. (Sec. 1) This bill specifies that a federal banking agency may not establish an operational-risk capital requirement for banking organizations unless the requirement: (1) is based on, and is appropriately sensitive to, current risks; (2) is determined under a forward-looking assessment of potential losses; and (3) allows certain adjustments. (Sec. 2) The bill amends the Federal Reserve Act to lower the maximum allowable amount of surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks.
Title
To place requirements on operational risk capital requirements for banking organizations established by an appropriate Federal banking agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 88 (Y: 185 N: 228 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - House - On passage RC# 89 (Y: 245 N: 169 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - On passage RC# 89 (Y: 245 N: 169 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-27 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 169 (Roll no. 89). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1308) |
2018-02-27 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 185 - 228 (Roll no. 88). |
2018-02-27 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2018-02-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Waters(CA) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add an exemption to the underlying bill for any global systematically important bank holding company or subsidiary that has engaged in a pattern or practice of unsafe or unsound banking practices related to consumer harm. |
2018-02-27 | House | Ms. Waters, Maxine moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H1314-1315) |
2018-02-27 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-02-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4296. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure. |
2018-02-27 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 747. (consideration: CR H1308-1317) |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 747 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure. |
2018-02-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434. |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-574. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 17. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
HR747 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR747 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.