US HB4296 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends federal law to extend the federal immigration law transition period for the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (CNMI) through December 31, 2019, including: (1) the annual reduction of nonimmigrant H-visa workers who may be admitted to work in the CNMI, and the exclusion of such workers in Guam and the CNMI from national H-visa limits; (2) the prohibition on asylum claims in the CNMI; and (3) the authority for CNMI-only nonimmigrant investors. Eliminates the Secretary of Labor's authority to extend such transition period beyond December 31, 2019.
Title
To amend Public Law 94-241 with respect to the Northern Mariana Islands.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 529. |
2014-12-22 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-698, Part I. |
2014-05-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-29 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-04-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands
U.S. territories and protectorates
Visas and passports
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands
U.S. territories and protectorates
Visas and passports