US HB4290 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Puerto Rico Emergency Financial Stability Act of 2015 This bill grants a temporary stay (until April 1, 2016, with specified exceptions) of any litigation, liens, or other collection actions to recover debts owed by the government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and allows relief from such stay only in limited circumstances.
Title
Puerto Rico Emergency Financial Stability Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-12-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H10695) |
2015-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2436 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4900 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB4900 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Caribbean area
Civil actions and liability
Debt collection
Economics and public finance
Financial crises and stabilization
Government lending and loan guarantees
Puerto Rico
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Caribbean area
Civil actions and liability
Debt collection
Economics and public finance
Financial crises and stabilization
Government lending and loan guarantees
Puerto Rico
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4290/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4290/BILLS-114hr4290ih.pdf |