US HB4290 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wakefield Act of 2014 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the Emergency Medical Services for Children Program through FY2019.
Title
Wakefield Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 558. |
2014-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7343) |
2014-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4290. |
2014-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7343-7344) |
2014-09-09 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 419. |
2014-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-559. |
2014-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent . |
2014-06-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2154 (Related) 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-180.
Subjects
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding