US HB4284 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
INFO Act Indexing Narcotics, Fentanyl, and Opioids Act of 2018 This bill requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to appoint a federal coordinator within the Department of Health and Human Services to: coordinate programs related to opioid abuse reduction, liaise with state and local entities carrying out activities relating to opioid abuse reduction, and establish and operate a publicly available electronic database to facilitate data collection related to opioid abuse.
Title
INFO Act Indexing Narcotics, Fentanyl, and Opioids Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5034-5035) |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4284. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5034-5036) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Intergovernmental relations
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
Veterans' medical care
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Intergovernmental relations
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
Veterans' medical care