US HB4284 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Service Provider Opportunity Clarification Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to issue regulations providing examples of activities that would be considered a failure to make a good faith effort to comply with the requirements imposed on any entity (other than a small business) awarded a prime contract exceeding $500,000 (or exceeding $1 million if for construction of a public facility) that contains an SBA clause that: notifies potential offering companies of SBA requirements relating to contracts awarded pursuant to the negotiated method of procurement; or requires any bidder selected for a contract reward to submit to the appropriate federal agency a subcontracting plan which incorporates specified SBA information.
Title
Service Provider Opportunity Clarification Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2016-04-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1830) |
2016-04-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4284. |
2016-04-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1830-1831) |
2016-04-19 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-12-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2015-12-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2138 (Related) 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-415.
HB4341 (Related) 2016-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
HB4341 (Related) 2016-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commerce
Disability and paralysis
Economic development
Government information and archives
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Commerce
Disability and paralysis
Economic development
Government information and archives
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business