US HB4264 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Defense make available certain records relevant to a determination of whether a member of the Armed Forces is disqualified from possessing or receiving a firearm, and for other purposes.
Title
Safe Homefront Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Judicial procedure and administration
Licensing and registrations
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Judicial procedure and administration
Licensing and registrations
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4264/BILLS-116hr4264ih.pdf |