US HB4252 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide additional funding for scholarships for students at 1890 institutions.
Title
To provide additional funding for scholarships for students at 1890 institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 126. |
2021-11-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-172. |
2021-10-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 3. |
2021-10-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-21 | House | Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Discharged. |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2021-06-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-06-30 | House | Introduced in House |