US HB425 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FTO Passport Revocation Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Passport Act of 1926 to authorize the Department of State to: (1) refuse to issue a passport to an individual who has aided, assisted, abetted, or otherwise helped a foreign terrorist organization designated pursuant to the Immigration and Nationality Act; or (2) revoke a passport previously issued to any such individual; A person whose passport is denied or revoked may request a State Department hearing within 60 days of receiving notice of such action. If the State Department refuses to issue or revokes a passport, or if subsequent to a hearing the State Department issues or cancels a revocation of a passport that was the subject of such a hearing, the State Department shall report to Congress within 30 days regarding such action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FTO Passport Revocation Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-02SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2017-11-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8363)
2017-11-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 425.
2017-11-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8363-8365)
2017-11-01HouseMr. Poe (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-28HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-28HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-07-19HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2017-07-19HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
2017-01-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1757 (Related) 2017-09-05 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback