US HB4243 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 867.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 867.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VA Asset and Infrastructure Review Act of 2017 Official Titles Official Titles - House of Representatives Official Title as Introduced To establish a commission for the purpose of making recommendations regarding the modernization or realignment of facilities of the Veterans Health Administration, to improve construction and management leases of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to amend and appropriate funds for the Veterans Choice Program, and for other purposes. VA Asset and Infrastructure Review Act of 2017 This bill establishes the Asset and Infrastructure Review Commission, which shall make recommendations to the President regarding the closure, modernization, and/or realignment of Veterans Health Administration (VHA) facilities based upon its own and Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) recommendations. The President shall transmit to the commission and to Congress a report containing the President's approval or disapproval of such recommendations by February 15, 2023. Within three years after transmittal of such report, the commission shall begin to implement the recommendations approved by the President and not disapproved by Congress. The commission shall: (1) carry out appropriate environmental restoration and historic preservation in connection with facility closures or realignments, and (2) consult with state and local governments with respect to the treatment of roads or the disposal of surplus real property or infrastructure. The VA may transfer the title of a VHA facility to the facility's redevelopment authority for lease to the VA or another federal agency. The bill establishes in the Treasury the Department of Veterans Affairs Asset and Infrastructure Review Account. The bill revises the definitions of: (1) "major medical facility project," and (2) "major medical facility lease." The VA may enter into agreements with other federal agencies for the planning, designing, constructing, or leasing of shared medical facilities. The Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 is amended to exclude recruitment, relocation, or retention incentives from the limitation on awards and bonuses. The bill provides funds for: (1) the Veterans Choice Program, and (2) medical facility minor construction and nonrecurring maintenance.
Title
VA Asset and Infrastructure Review Act of 2017 Official Titles Official Titles - House of Representatives Official Title as Introduced To establish a commission for the purpose of making recommendations regarding the modernization or realignment of facilities of the Veterans Health Administration, to improve construction and management leases of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to amend and appropriate funds for the Veterans Choice Program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 867. |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee on Appropriations discharged. |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee on Rules discharged. |
2018-11-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018. |
2018-11-16 | House | House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018. |
2018-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1036, Part I. |
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10. |
2017-11-08 | House | Approved Further Amendments To Measure Previously Reported. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5674 (Related) 2018-05-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 516.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Historic sites and heritage areas
Legislative rules and procedure
Veterans' medical care
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Historic sites and heritage areas
Legislative rules and procedure
Veterans' medical care