US HB4209 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
America Wins Act The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose an excise tax on the carbon dioxide content of coal, petroleum and petroleum products, and natural gas sold by the manufacturer, producer, or importer and require the revenues to be used for infrastructure and other purposes. Refunds or credits for the tax must be issued for carbon substances that are: (1) not emitted due to use as a feedstock or through carbon capture and sequestration, or (2) previously taxed carbon substances used to make another taxable carbon substance. The bill includes border adjustment provisions that require certain fees, credits, or refunds for carbon-intensive goods that are exported or imported. The bill also establishes a Build America Trust Fund and appropriates to the fund amounts equal to the increase in revenues attributable to the tax. Specified amounts of the funds must be used, without further appropriation, for infrastructure, including highways and transit; aviation; passenger rail; harbors, waterways, flood protection, and dams; clean water; Department of Agriculture water and waste disposal programs; and broadband deployment. Specified portions of the funds must also be used for: providing assistance to workers and communities reliant on industries that primarily produce taxable carbon substances or carbon-intensive goods, an energy refund program to provide payments to certain low-income households, and a refundable tax credit for households that meet specified income requirements.
Title
America Wins Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2014 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Air quality
Aviation and airports
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Energy prices
Environmental technology
Floods and storm protection
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Mining
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Sales and excise taxes
Solid waste and recycling
Taxation
Transportation programs funding
Water quality
Air quality
Aviation and airports
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Energy prices
Environmental technology
Floods and storm protection
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Mining
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Sales and excise taxes
Solid waste and recycling
Taxation
Transportation programs funding
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4209/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4209/BILLS-115hr4209ih.pdf |