US HB4207 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small and Seasonal Business Relief Act This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to exempt returning workers from the nonimmigrant H-2B visa (temporary nonagricultural services) annual numerical limitations: (1) through FY2018 for those individuals already counted toward such limitation in FY2016 or FY2017, and (2) during the next fiscal year for those individuals already counted toward such limitation in FY2018 or FY2019. Such amendment shall take effect as if enacted on October 1, 2017.
Title
Small and Seasonal Business Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1627 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Temporary and part-time employment
Visas and passports
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Temporary and part-time employment
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4207/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4207/BILLS-115hr4207ih.pdf |