US HB4203 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Combat Online Predators Act This bill amends the federal criminal code increase the maximum prison term for a stalking offense, if the victim is under 18 years of age.
Title
Combat Online Predators Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 131 (Y: 409 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.4179 Amendment SA 4179 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | S.Amdt.4179 Amendment SA 4179 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S8036; text: CR S8036) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8036) |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 409 - 2 (Roll No. 131). (text: CR H3078-3079) |
2018-04-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3081-3082) |
2018-04-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-04-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4203. |
2018-04-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3078-3080) |
2018-04-10 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 480. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-627. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3306 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations