US HB4196 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend for one year the 100% bonus depreciation allowance for business assets, and (2) increase the amount of alternative minimum tax (AMT) credits that corporate taxpayers may elect to accelerate in a taxable year in lieu of claiming bonus depreciation.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the allowance for bonus depreciation for certain business assets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3630 (Related) 2012-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 112-96.
SB2237 (Related) 2012-07-12 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 341.
SB2240 (Same As) 2012-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1773 (Related) 2011-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5974 (Related) 2012-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB12 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2237 (Related) 2012-07-12 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 341.
SB2240 (Same As) 2012-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1773 (Related) 2011-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5974 (Related) 2012-06-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB12 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4196/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4196/BILLS-112hr4196ih.pdf |