US HB419 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Knife Owners' Protection Act of 2015 Entitles any person who is not otherwise prohibited by federal law from possessing, transporting, shipping, or receiving a knife to transport a knife from any place where such person may lawfully possess, carry, or transport such a knife to any other place where such person may lawfully do so: (1) by motor vehicle if the knife is not directly accessible from the passenger compartment or is in a locked container, glove compartment, or console; or (2) by other means over land or through water or the air if the knife is in a locked container. Allows any knife or tool designed for enabling escape in an emergency incorporating a blunt tipped safety blade, a guarded blade, or both for cutting safety belts to be carried in the passenger compartment without being secured in a locked container, glove compartment, or console, except in the passenger cabin of aircraft whose passengers are subject to airport screening procedures of the Transportation Security Administration.
Title
Knife Owners' Protection Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB567 (Related) 2015-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1315 (Related) 2015-08-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 201.
SB1315 (Related) 2015-08-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 201.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Federal preemption
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Federal preemption
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/419/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr419/BILLS-114hr419ih.pdf |