US HB4182 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EQUALS Act of 2017 Ensuring a Qualified Civil Service Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EQUALS Act of 2017 Ensuring a Qualified Civil Service Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-30 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 195 N: 221 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-30 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 193 N: 223 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-30 - House - On Passage (Y: 213 N: 204 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-01SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2017-11-30HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-30HouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 213 - 204 (Roll no. 648).
2017-11-30HouseThe House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
2017-11-30HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2017-11-30HouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 4182.
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.491 On agreeing to the Connolly amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 193 - 223 (Roll no. 647).
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.489 On agreeing to the Hastings amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 195 - 221 (Roll no. 646).
2017-11-30HouseUNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on adoption of amendments, which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
2017-11-30HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Connolly amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Connolly demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
2017-11-30HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 635, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Connolly amendment no. 4.
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.491 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Connolly. (consideration: CR H9555-9556, H9557-9558; text: CR H9555)
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.490 On agreeing to the Gianforte amendment (A002) as modified Agreed to by voice vote.
2017-11-30HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 635, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gianforte amendment no. 3, as modified.
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.490 Gianforte amendment (A002) modified by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9555; text as modified: CR H9555)
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.490 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gianforte. (consideration: CR H9555; text: CR H9555)
2017-11-30HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Hastings amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Comer demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
2017-11-30HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 635, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Hastings amendment no. 1.
2017-11-30HouseH.Amdt.489 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Hastings. (consideration: CR H9554-9555, H9556-9557; text: CR H9554)
2017-11-30HouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 4182.
2017-11-30HouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee.
2017-11-30HouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 635 and Rule XVIII.
2017-11-30HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 and H.R. 1699. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 1699 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
2017-11-30HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 635. (consideration: CR H9547-9559; text of measure as reported in House: CR H9553-9554)
2017-11-29HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 635 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 and H.R. 1699. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 1699 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
2017-11-28HouseSupplemental report filed by the Committee on Oversight and Government, H. Rept. 115-415, Part II.
2017-11-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
2017-11-16HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-415.
2017-11-02HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 17.
2017-11-02HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-10-31HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2017-10-31HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR635 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback