US HB4167 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of Energy from changing energy conservation standards for distribution transformers for a certain period, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting America’s Distribution Transformer Supply Chain Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 22. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-10-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13. |
2023-10-24 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Related) 2023-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4167/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4167/BILLS-118hr4167ih.pdf |