US HB4136 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDEA Full Funding Act - Amends the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA) to reauthorize and make appropriations for the grant program to assist states and outlying areas in providing special education and related services to children with disabilities. Sets the amount to be authorized and the amount to be appropriated for each fiscal year from FY2015-FY2023 as the greater of: (1) a specified amount, or (2) a specified percentage of an amount determined pursuant to a formula that multiplies the number of children receiving special education services by the average per-pupil expenditure in public elementary and secondary schools. Authorizes and appropriates funds for FY2024 and each subsequent fiscal year equal to the greater of a specified amount or 40% of the amount determined using such formula. Requires amounts appropriated to be expended consistent with pay-as-you-go requirements.
Title
IDEA Full Funding Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2789 (Related) 2014-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5661 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
HB5661 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Subjects
Appropriations
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Special education
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Special education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4136/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4136/BILLS-113hr4136ih.pdf |