US HB4129 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Public Option Act This bill allows residents not already eligible for Medicaid who are not concurrently enrolled in other health insurance coverage to buy into a state Medicaid plan beginning January 1, 2018. The bill makes such buy-in coverage eligible for premium subsidies and reduced cost sharing under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. The Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality shall develop standardized, state-level metrics of access to, and satisfaction with, providers for individuals enrolled in state Medicaid plans. Primary care services furnished under Medicaid by certain providers must be paid at a rate that is not less than the rate under Medicare part B. Beginning in FY2019, the Department of Health and Human Services may award grants to states for the purpose of improving access to services for individuals enrolled in state Medicaid plans. The bill provides the enhanced federal medical assistance percentage to every state that expands Medicaid coverage for individuals who are newly eligible under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, regardless of when such expansion takes place.
Title
State Public Option Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D-NV] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2001 (Same As) 2017-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Appropriations
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Medicare
Performance measurement
State and local finance
Women's health
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Medicare
Performance measurement
State and local finance
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4129/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4129/BILLS-115hr4129ih.pdf |