US HB410 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for hospital and insurer price transparency.
Title
Health Care PRICE Transparency Act Health Care Prices Revealed and Information to Consumers Explained Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2840 (Related) 2023-11-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242.
SB2840 (Related) 2023-11-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/410/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr410/BILLS-118hr410ih.pdf |