US HB409 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the limitation on the amount of distilled spirits excise taxes covered over (paid) to the treasuries of the Virgin Islands and Puerto Rico.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the limitation on the cover over of distilled spirits taxes to the Virgin Islands and Puerto Rico.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1786 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3101 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5687 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 416.
SB3101 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5687 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 416.
Subjects
Alcoholic beverages
Caribbean area
Intergovernmental relations
Puerto Rico
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Caribbean area
Intergovernmental relations
Puerto Rico
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/409/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr409/BILLS-116hr409ih.pdf |