US HB4073 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture to accept the quitclaim, disclaimer, and relinquishment by the Manitou and Pikes Peak Railway Company of a specified right-of-way adjacent to Pike National Forest that was originally granted to the Mt. Manitou Park and Incline Railway Company for the construction of a railroad and station in El Paso County, Colorado.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to accept the quitclaim, disclaimer, and relinquishment of a railroad right of way within and adjacent to Pike National Forest in El Paso County, Colorado, originally granted to the Mt. Manitou Park and Incline Railway Company pursuant to the Act of March 3, 1875.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-250. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8552-8556) |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2012-08-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-08-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/31/2012 H5432) |
2012-08-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5599) |
2012-07-31 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Sablan objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2012-07-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4073. |
2012-07-31 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5432-5433) |
2012-07-31 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-07-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434. |
2012-07-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-599. |
2012-06-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2012-06-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-06-07 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2012-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2341 (Related) 2012-04-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.