US HB4071 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
China Hurts Economic Advancement Through Subsidies Act or CHEATS Act - Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to authorize the administering authority or the U.S. International Trade Commission (USITC) to impose countervailing duties on products from a nonmarket economy country that have been provided a countervailable subsidy.
Title
CHEATS Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Related) 2011-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1267 (Related) 2011-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1267 (Related) 2011-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4071/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4071/BILLS-112hr4071ih.pdf |