US HB4066 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nuclear Innovation Act This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to carry out a program for enhancing the U.S. capability to develop new reactor technologies through high-performance computation modeling and simulation techniques. Such program shall coordinate with relevant federal agencies through the National Strategic Computing Initiative while taking into account specified objectives. DOE shall also carry out a program to: enable the testing and demonstration of reactor concepts proposed and funded by the private sector, and leverage the technical expertise of relevant federal agencies and national laboratories to minimize the time required to enable construction and operation of privately funded experimental reactors at national laboratories or other DOE-owned sites. These reactors shall operate to: enable physical validation of novel reactor concepts; resolve technical uncertainty and increase practical knowledge relevant to safety, resilience, security, and functionality of first-of-a-kind reactor concepts; and generate research and development to improve nascent technologies.
Title
Nuclear Innovation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2015-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2015-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4084 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
Subjects
Computers and information technology
Energy
Energy research
Nuclear power
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Energy
Energy research
Nuclear power
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4066/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4066/BILLS-114hr4066ih.pdf |