US HB4051 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cold War Service Medal Act of 2009 - Authorizes the Secretary of the military department concerned to issue the Cold War Service Medal to members of the Armed Forces who were discharged or released under honorable conditions after having: (1) served on active duty for at least 24 consecutive months during the Cold War (September 2, 1945, through December 26, 1991); (2) deployed outside the continental United States for at least 30 days during such period; or (3) performed other Cold War service as the Secretary of Defense may prescribe. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary should expedite the design of the Medal as well its issuance to eligible members.
Title
Cold War Service Medal Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-18 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-11-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2743 (Same As) 2009-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4051/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4051/BILLS-111hr4051ih.pdf |