US HB404 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Landscape Conservation System Act - Establishes in the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) the National Landscape Conservation System (thus, enacting into law the National Landscape Conservation System [NLCS] created by BLM in 2000) in order to conserve, protect, and restore nationally significant landscapes that have outstanding cultural, ecological, and scientific values for the benefit of current and future generations.
Title
National Landscape Conservation System Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Mary Bono Mack [R-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Gabrielle Giffords [D-AZ] |
Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Bart Gordon [D-TN] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] |
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Jay Inslee [D-WA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] | Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
Subjects
California
Forests
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/404/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr404/BILLS-111hr404ih.pdf |