US HB4032 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide outreach and technical assistance to small providers regarding the benefits of Open RAN networks, and for other purposes.
Title
Open RAN Outreach Act
Sponsors
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 410 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-10-20 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 17 (Roll no. 324). (text: CR 10/19/2021 H5656) |
2021-10-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5702-5703) |
2021-10-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-10-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4032. |
2021-10-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5656-5657) |
2021-10-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-10-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 110. |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-150. |
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-20 | House | Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Discharged. |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |