US HB4031 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deems claims presented to an Indian Health Service contracting officer pursuant to the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act on or before October 31, 2005, involving claims that accrued after October 1, 1995, and on or before September 30, 1999, to have been timely presented.
Title
To provide that claims presented to an Indian Health Service contracting officer pursuant to the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act on or before October 31, 2005, involving claims that accrued after October 1, 1995 and on or before September 30, 1999, shall be deemed timely presented.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2012-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2389 (Related) 2012-09-20 - By Senator Akaka from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 112-228.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Department of Health and Human Services
Federal-Indian relations
Health
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Department of Health and Human Services
Federal-Indian relations
Health
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4031/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4031/BILLS-112hr4031ih.pdf |