US HB4029 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an Indian tribe or tribally designated housing entity to apply for a Homeless Assistance Grant under the Continuum of Care Program administered by the Department of Housing and Urban Development. Under current law, nonprofit and government entities may apply for and use such grants to provide shelter and other services to eligible individuals.
Title
Tribal Access to Homeless Assistance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8926) |
2019-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4029. |
2019-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8926-8927) |
2019-11-18 | House | Mr. Green, Al (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2282 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6321 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6321 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Small Business, the Judiciary, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs