US HB401 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 138.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 138.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the mountain at the Devils Tower National Monument, Wyoming, as Devils Tower, and for other purposes. This bill declares that the mountain at the Devils Tower National Monument in Wyoming shall be known and designated as "Devils Tower."
Title
To designate the mountain at the Devils Tower National Monument, Wyoming, as Devils Tower, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 138. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-630. |
2018-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-14 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB70 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wyoming
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wyoming