US HB4007 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses stormwater runoff from mining, oil, or gas operations. Specifically, it eliminates a prohibition on the Environmental Protection Agency from requiring a permit under the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System for discharges of certain collected, uncontaminated stormwater runoff from mining operations or oil and gas operations. In addition, the Department of the Interior must study stormwater runoff associated with oil or gas operations, including an analysis of (1) measurable contamination, (2) groundwater resources, and (3) the susceptibility of aquifers to contamination from stormwater runoff associated with the operations.
Title
FRESHER Act of 2019 Focused Reduction of Effluence and Stormwater runoff through Hydrofracking Environmental Regulation Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB436 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB6112 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB6112 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Water quality
Agricultural practices and innovations
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4007/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4007/BILLS-116hr4007ih.pdf |