US HB4005 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Gauging American Port Security Act or the GAPS Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) conduct a study of gaps in U.S. port security and submit to Congress a report (in classified form but with an unclassified annex) that includes a prioritization of such gaps and a plan for addressing them; (2) share relevant information with designated points of contact from federal agencies, state, local, or tribal governments, and port system owners and operators in accordance with rules for the handling of classified information; and (3) help expedite the clearance process if a designated point of contact does not have the necessary security clearance to receive such information.
Title
GAPS Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 411 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 411 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 411 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2012-06-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-06-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 9 (Roll no. 439). (text: CR 6/26/2012 H4009) |
2012-06-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4176-4177) |
2012-06-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. King (NY) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2012-06-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4005. |
2012-06-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4009-4011) |
2012-06-26 | House | Mr. King (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352. |
2012-05-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-499. |
2012-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2012-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-05-09 | House | Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2012-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Emergency management
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security