US HB40 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 197-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To address the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery in the United States and the 13 American colonies between 1619 and 1865 and to establish a commission to study and consider a national apology and proposal for reparations for the institution of slavery, its subsequent de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination against African Americans, and the impact of these forces on living African Americans, to make recommendations to the Congress on appropriate remedies, and for other purposes.
Title
Commission to Study and Develop Reparation Proposals for African Americans Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17. |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-13 | House | Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Discharged. |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2) |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB40 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/40/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr40/BILLS-117hr40ih.pdf |