US HB3992 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 112-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 112-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes Israeli nationals eligible to enter the United States as E-2 visa nonimmigrant investors as provided for under the Immigration and Nationality Act if Israel provides reciprocal nonimmigrant treatment to U.S. nationals.
Title
To allow otherwise eligible Israeli nationals to receive E-2 nonimmigrant visas if similarly situated United States nationals are eligible for similar nonimmigrant status in Israel.
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Elton Gallegly [R-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 371 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 371 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 371 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-130. |
2012-06-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3658) |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2012-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-03-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 0 (Roll no. 111). (text: CR H1372) |
2012-03-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1374) |
2012-03-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3992. |
2012-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1372-1373) |
2012-03-19 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282. |
2012-03-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-410. |
2012-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-02-27 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Discharged. |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement. |
2012-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB921 (Same As) 2011-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Israel
Middle East
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Immigration status and procedures
Israel
Middle East
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports